Accounts and annual returns GREENFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 295145
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 September 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 17 September 2024 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 20 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 October 2020 98 days late Download Open in new window