Financial history GREENFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 295145
Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.67m £3.95m £3.80m £4.97m £5.42m
Total expenditure £2.78m £4.19m £4.25m £5.36m £5.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £140.76k £247.59k £261.98k £151.80k £48.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.74k £16.88k £9.99k £11.12k £6.33k
Income - Other trading activities £24.97k £136.17k £60.15k £174.95k £48.65k
Income - Charitable activities £2.60m £3.04m £3.72m £4.77m £5.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £38.03k £31.04k £13.58k £13.66k £16.71k
Income - Other £0 £727.30k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.37m £3.41m £3.70m £5.36m £5.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £17.94k £0 £15.23k £9.54k £13.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £407.63k £780.18k £549.51k £0 £0