Trustees GREENFIELD SCHOOL
Charity number: 295145

Charity reporting is up to date (79 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET ROSEMARY DAY | Chair | 28 October 1996 |
|
|
||||
David Walmsley | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Weston Moors | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Blagden | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madelene Cook | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE ANNE BECKETT | Trustee | 10 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK PHILLIPS | Trustee | 10 March 2006 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.