WELFORD SPORTS FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and administration of the local sports ground.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 September 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN SCULLION | Chair | 16 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK WATTS | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Bland | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN DAVID HOWELL-JONES | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN RICHARD BOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.48k | £15.43k | £47.53k | £9.43k | £8.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.31k | £8.09k | £4.11k | £21.75k | £17.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WELFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO: (A) CREATE, IMPROVE AND EXTEND PLAYING AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; (B) ENCOURAGE ALL FORMS OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY.
Area of benefit
WELFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 WAKEFIELD DRIVE
WELFORD
NORTHAMPTON
NN6 6HN
- Phone:
- 01858575784
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window