THE ROYAL ENGINEERS MUSEUM

Charity number: 295173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To collect, preserve and present accessibly the works and activities of the Royal Engineers through a Museum and Library; to educate and promote scholarship and enjoyment therein for military and civilian customers; thereby to contribute positively to the proficiency, reputation and efficiency of the Royal Engineers, the recruitment and inspiration of its members and the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RE MUSEUM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAJOR GENERAL NICHOLAS CAVANAGH CB Chair 17 October 2018
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Colonel Alexander John Harris OBE Trustee 22 November 2024
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Brigadier Peter Thomas Quaite OBE Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Colonel Alastair James Cooper Trustee 05 February 2024
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Colonel Simon Justin Graham Trustee 05 February 2024
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
BRIGADIER SIMON JOHN CARVEL Trustee 13 July 2023
ROYAL ENGINEERS CENTRAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Corps SM Spencer William Arnold Eardley Trustee 30 June 2023
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
COL RICHARD HAWKINS MBE ADC Trustee 14 November 2022
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Brig James D Webster Trustee 03 May 2022
INSTITUTION OF ROYAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Col Jonathan Layton Prichard KVRM Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Major General David W Southall CBE Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £784.46k £835.66k £1.08m £634.54k £752.86k
Total expenditure £815.39k £796.41k £2.62m £793.94k £1.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £228.28k £243.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £592.36k £720.09k £754.56k £482.55k £556.90k
Income - Other trading activities £139.55k £62.11k £94.28k £117.11k £137.79k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £52.56k £53.46k £41.43k £32.49k £36.31k
Income - Other £0 £0 £194.45k £2.39k £21.86k
Income - Legacies £79.17k £79.17k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £785.41k £771.55k £2.59m £750.17k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.98k £24.85k £28.12k £43.77k £51.26k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £564.36k £528.35k £472.63k £412.93k £154.87k
Long-term investments £1.49m £1.57m £983.56k £846.38k £848.87k
Other assets £1.40m £1.47m £825.57k £674.34k £671.77k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £8.05k £3.97k £142.16k £90.64k £146.09k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL ENGINEERS MUSEUM
BROMPTON BARRACKS
CHATHAM
ME4 4UG
Phone:
01634822312