Governing document NATIONAL WOMEN'S REGISTER
Charity number: 295198

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1986 AND AMENDED 6TH AUGUST 1987, 3RD APRIL 2004 AND 11 SEPTEMBER 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 JUN 2017 as amended on 11 Sept 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF FEMALE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF BOTH URBAN AND RURAL LIFE FOR THEM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.