CHASA MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY OF THE U K

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HELP POOR, NEEDY, HELPLESS AND HANDICAPPED IN CHASA VILLAGE. ALLIEVIATION OF SICKNESS. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. FUTHERANCE OF ISLAM. REPAIRS TO MOSQUE, CEMETERY AND GUEST HOUSE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 01 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAZIR AHMED MULLA | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALIBHAI ESSAKJI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOOSA HASAN SEEDAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.98k | £18.20k | £18.98k | £18.35k | £12.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.44k | £1.76k | £425 | £0 | £10.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND FURTHER THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AMONGST THE MUSLIM INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CHASA, DISTRICT BULSAR, GUJARAT, INDIA AND AMONST MUSLIMS WHO HAVE A CLOSE CONNECTION WITH THE VILLAGE RESULTING FROM THEIR OWN OR THEIR FAMILIES' PREVIOUS RESIDENCE OR ORIGIN IN THE VILLAGE.
Area of benefit
CHASA VILLAGE, INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 KEELE WALK
BLACKBURN
BB1 1EH
- Phone:
- 01254690420
- Email:
- salehs@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window