DARTFORD AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the arts in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 23 December 1986: Standard registration
- D A O D S (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Farlie | Chair | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ann Bull | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Howe | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cross | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Moore | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fromings | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meghan Elizabeth Walsh | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mason | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Woodley | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAM EADES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.13k | £17.58k | £126.84k | £123.70k | £100.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.72k | £20.49k | £153.10k | £142.62k | £81.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 27 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED 29 JUNE 1992 as amended on 26 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ART AND DRAMA AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ART
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heathfields Hall
Heath Lane
DARTFORD
DA1 2QH
- Phone:
- 01322 761032
- Email:
- daodscom@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window