Trustees DARTFORD AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 295226

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Farlie | Chair | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ann Bull | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasmin Howe | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cross | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Moore | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Fromings | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meghan Elizabeth Walsh | Trustee | 08 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mason | Trustee | 27 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Woodley | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAM EADES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.