Accounts and annual returns GREAT HOLM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 295229
Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 March 2022 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2022 412 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required