THE ISLE OF WIGHT INTERNATIONAL INDOOR GAMES FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 1986: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE ISLE OF WIGHT SPECIAL OLYMPICS FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1986 AND SCHEME SEALED 12TH AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
CONTRIBUTING TO THE PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL DEVELOPMENT OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY PROMOTING TTHE 1987 GAMES AND IN PARTICULAR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN PROVIDING TRAVEL AND ACCOMMODATION FOR PARTICIPANTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND HELPERS, THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE GAMES, AND THE HIRE OR PURCHASE OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window