Financial history CAMBRIDGE EXPEDITIONS FUND

Charity Number: 295233
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008 30/06/2009
Total gross income £3.00k £1.03k £88 £54 £0
Total expenditure £2.90k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A