20TH CHISWICK SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 295236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,493
Total expenditure: £7,708

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hounslow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 October 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Jeanette Simpson Trustee 06 July 2024
None on record
Vincent Thompson Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Peter Thompson Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Amanda Louise Jennings Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
John Henry Weavers Trustee 02 July 2016
None on record
LEON PATRICK MIELEWCZYK Trustee
THAMESIDE GRAND UNION DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
GREATER LONDON MIDDLESEX WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Yvonne May Mielewczyk Trustee
None on record
VALERIE ANN WEAVERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.88k £13.22k £16.61k £11.88k £10.49k
Total expenditure £12.61k £4.19k £8.20k £8.55k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £11.36k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 WHITTON DENE
HOUNSLOW
TW3 2JT
Phone:
02088980549
Email:
No information available