Accounts and annual returns LITTLE HORWOOD RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 295245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2024 361 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2023 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2024 726 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2022 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 April 2021 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required