THE FRIENDS OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE COUNTRY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve or assist in the preservation for the benefit of the public of Mount Edgcumbe Country Park Cornwall as a place of histoical, botanical, horticultural,architectural and natural beauty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 20 October 1986: Standard registration
- THE FMECP (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben John Church | Chair | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maud Diane Celine Evans | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simon Hughes | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MARY KNIGHT | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHANE PERRY | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rozanne Griffiths - Woodcock | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harold Vosper | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Vosper | Trustee | 05 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN DRUMMOND | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £562.05k | £20.04k | £33.29k | £30.64k | £34.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £520.09k | £11.91k | £48.34k | £36.70k | £32.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £526.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £473 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £34.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £476 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £129 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £23.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £516.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £512.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH AUGUST 1986, AND AMENDED ON 25 APRIL 1997.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE OR ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE COUNTRY PARK AS A PLACE OF HISTORICAL, BONTANICAL, HORTICULTURAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND NATURAL BEAUTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Mt. Edgcumbe
Mount Edgcumbe House
TORPOINT
Cornwall
PL10 1HZ
- Phone:
- 07808176581
- Email:
- chair@fomecp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window