Financial history COMMUNITY CONNEX LTD.

Charity number: 295263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.64m £2.64m £2.44m £2.97m £2.42k
Total expenditure £2.60m £2.40m £2.52m £2.73m £2.69k
Income from government contracts £2.04m N/A N/A £1.60m N/A
Income from government grants £265.57k £508.33k £403.00k £360.39k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £360.58k £529.39k £418.00k £475.81k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £118.44k £134.00k £200.21k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.04m £1.99m £1.88m £2.29m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £213 £5.00k £2.80k N/A
Income - Other £234.59k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.54m £2.35m £2.44m £2.67m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £67.08k £54.85k £78.00k £56.82k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.76k £5.56k £9.00k £7.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A