THE SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL NETWORK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting other charities and making grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANINE EDGE MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edi Bilimoria | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
MR Mark Adam Parkin | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
OONAGH HARPUR BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £10.21k | £7.25k | £8.86k | £14.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.90k | £35.90k | £20.45k | £29.38k | £27.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1986
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND RELIGION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY THE STUDY OF THE VARIOUS ASPECTS OF TRUTH PRESENTED THROUGH THE ARTS, THE SCIENCES AND ALL RELIGIONS IN WHICH MAY BE FOUND SPIRITUAL TRUTHS NECESSARY FOR MAN'S FULLEST DEVELOPMENT THROUGH HIS UNDERSTANDING THE LAWS OF LIFE AND OF LIVING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beacon Cottage
Crespigny Road
Aldeburgh
IP15 5EZ
- Phone:
- 01728451499
- Email:
- info@scimednet.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window