Accounts and annual returns CHOLSEY AND WALLINGFORD RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 295279
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 March 2025 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 March 2025 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 August 2024 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 August 2024 282 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 February 2021 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 February 2021 97 days late Download Open in new window