Trustees CHOLSEY AND WALLINGFORD RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity Number: 295279
Charity reporting is up to date (129 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Mark Hoptroff Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Natalie Wilson Trustee 16 September 2024
None on record
Andrew Midwinter Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
John Richard Sharman Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Robert Owen Hill Trustee 14 October 2023
None on record
Mark Savery Trustee 24 January 2021
RAINBOW PRE-SCHOOL (WALLINGFORD)
Received: On time
Timothy Stephen Fediw Trustee 23 November 2019
None on record
Michael Palfrey Trustee 23 November 2019
None on record