Financial history BROMLEY TRUST HELPING ELDERLY PEOPLE

Charity number: 295300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.34k £2.32k £4.95k £1.02k £2.80k
Total expenditure £1.82k £444 £1.37k £5.16k £675
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A