WESTNELL NURSERY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Westnell nursery society was set up in1986 to advance the education of the poorest and most disadvantaged children below school age in Lima, Peru. We currently support two nurseries educating 250 children per year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Peru
Governance
- 01 October 1986: Standard registration
- 02 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.60k | £25.40k | £20.15k | £17.71k | £8.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.50k | £23.72k | £21.22k | £21.47k | £9.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 19 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 10 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 10 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 14TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW SCHOOL AGE IN LIMA, PERU, BY PROVIDING SAFE AND STIMULATING GROUP PLAY AND OTHER LEARNING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LIMA (PERU)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window