Financial history PAN INTERCULTURAL ARTS

Charity number: 295324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £347.22k £347.05k £520.95k £491.11k £652.61k
Total expenditure £347.96k £335.08k £419.02k £511.96k £639.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £181.34k £81.37k £50.01k £18.85k £110.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £516.87k N/A £645.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £4.08k N/A £6.16k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £5 N/A £1.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £419.02k N/A £639.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0