PAN INTERCULTURAL ARTS

Charity number: 295324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pan works across cultures, faiths and experiences to use the arts to empower young people to effect change in their lives, both in the UK and internationally. We particularly focus on disadvantaged groups and individuals who feel they have no voice to express their problems and no routes to re-imagine themselves and their futures.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Suffolk
  • Throughout London
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 October 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PAN CENTRE FOR INTERCULTURAL ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
  • PAN PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Wengard Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Melanie Hargreaves Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Hatice Soyal Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Maite Pierreux Brazier Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Alice Wan Hu Wagner Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Lloyd Philip Goldby Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Sophie Froment Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Adam Rupert Hugh Bray Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Abubaker Haron Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Takudzwa Mukiwa Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
Heather Fokerd Trustee 21 April 2015
None on record
Dr Sita Schutt Trustee 16 May 2011
None on record
Olajumoke Fashola Trustee
None on record
Brian St Louis Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £347.22k £347.05k £520.95k £491.11k £652.61k
Total expenditure £347.96k £335.08k £419.02k £511.96k £639.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £181.34k £81.37k £50.01k £18.85k £110.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £516.87k N/A £645.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £4.08k N/A £6.16k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £5 N/A £1.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £419.02k N/A £639.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A £397.11k N/A £360.03k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £216.05k N/A £186.90k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 February 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 February 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 32
O'Donnell Court
Brunswick Centre
London
WC1N 1NX
Phone:
02078332111