Trustees PAN INTERCULTURAL ARTS
Charity number: 295324

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Wengard | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Hargreaves | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hatice Soyal | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maite Pierreux Brazier | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Wan Hu Wagner | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Philip Goldby | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Froment | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Rupert Hugh Bray | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abubaker Haron | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Takudzwa Mukiwa | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Fokerd | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sita Schutt | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Olajumoke Fashola | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Brian St Louis | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.