FALMOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in the dramatic and operatic arts and to further the development of public appreciation and taste in the said arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 November 1986: Standard registration
- F A O D S (Working name)
- FALMOUTH AMATEUR OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Gibson | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Mooney | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HALLORAN | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.37k | £639 | £6 | £30.65k | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £5.38k | £1.53k | £38.77k | £4.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPEMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Turnaware Road
FALMOUTH
Cornwall
TR11 4PH
- Phone:
- 07968051414
- Website:
-
Falmouththeatrecompany.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window