Financial history NATIONAL DRAMA FESTIVALS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 295373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.44k £1.48k £3.80k £3.74k £4.09k
Total expenditure £2.33k £1.86k £3.78k £2.07k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A