GREAT EASTON PARISH HALL FUND

Charity number: 295400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Upkeep of the village hall, for use of meetings, social gatherings, hiring for childrens parties, and for all general use of the villages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,008
Total expenditure: £9,230

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Great Easton and Tilty Parish Council Trustee 10 October 2006
RECREATION GROUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.09k £10.74k £3.89k £5.11k £5.01k
Total expenditure £5.26k £2.65k £10.10k £9.81k £9.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 June 2022 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Great Easton Village Hall
Great Easton
DUNMOW
Essex
CM6 2HF
Phone:
01371 404220
Website:

No information available