FLITWICK GUIDE AND BROWNIE UNITS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsbile for the maintenance of Hetley House building and grounds. This premises is used by the FLITWICK District rainbows, brownies guides and rangers for weekly meetings. Flitwick District is part of Girl Guiding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 November 1986: Standard registration
- HETLEY HOUSE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Daughtry | Chair | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Richards | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bowley | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Carole Bowley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jane Thompson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN KEELING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.18k | £14.26k | £11.85k | £3.84k | £4.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.15k | £5.20k | £7.89k | £3.42k | £4.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 February 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
FLITWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 STATION ROAD
FLITWICK
BEDFORD
MK45 1JU
- Phone:
- 07917160761
- Email:
- flitwickguides@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window