THE FRIENDS OF BATCOMBE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fundraising for fabric etc of St Mary's Batcombe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 November 1986: Standard registration
- THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF BATCOMBE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER FREDERICK | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS GORE | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Glaisher | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.35k | £5.35k | £5.46k | £9.23k | £9.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53k | £3.64k | £7.78k | £6.92k | £28.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 OCT 1986 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND CURTILAGE OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY'S IN THE PARISH OF BATCOMBE ITS ORGAN AND BELLS AND PROVIDING SUCH FURNITURE FITTINGS AND STRUCTURES BOTH INTERIOR EXTERIOR AND IN THE CURTILAGE AS MAY BE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE COMMITTEE OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY BATCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Farm
Gold Hill
Batcombe
SHEPTON MALLET
Somerset
BA4 6HF
- Phone:
- 07976177885
- Email:
- christopherfrederick@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window