Accounts and annual returns PADDINGTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 295449
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 February 2025 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window