THE HERON WAY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money to support the education of children at Heron Way School with regular events including Summer Fete & Christmas Bazaar
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 November 1986: Standard registration
- HERON WAY P T A - HERON WAY SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mojahirul Hoque | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Waghorn | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steve Goodwin | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDWARD CRUMP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.78k | £24.54k | £4.93k | £26.41k | £36.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.83k | £33.30k | £4.10k | £14.53k | £36.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 August 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 August 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 January 2021 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 January 2021 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heron Way Primary School
Heron Way
HORSHAM
RH13 6DJ
- Phone:
- 01403261944
- Email:
- team@heronwaypta.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window