PHOENIX RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION (UPPER NORWOOD AREA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational (speakers) and leisure activities (outings and socials) for retired elderly men and women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 22 January 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Jane Jewell | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE ANN PEABODY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA WINIFRED BURLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £2.20k | £0 | £344 | £965 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £234 | £129 | £974 | £1.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AND AMENDED 24TH NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN THE UPPER NORWOOD AREA AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF FIFTY YEARS OR WHO HAVE RETIRED FROM FULL-TIME EMPLOYMENT. (II) TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF ENCOURAGING ACTIVE PARTICIPATION OF MEMBERS IN COMMUNITY SERVICES SO AS TO ENHANCE THE QUALITY OF LIFE AND PROMOTE GOOD PUBLIC RELATIONS.
Area of benefit
UPPER NORWOOD AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 AUCKLAND CLOSE
LONDON
SE19 2DA
- Phone:
- 02087719148
- Email:
- anneppike@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window