RAUNDS WINDMILL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds organising various activities/events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 November 1986: Standard registration
- 25 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- R W S A (Working name)
- RWSA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.51k | £2.43k | £2.60k | £6.50k | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.58k | £5.33k | £2.75k | £4.03k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL, AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
RAUNDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window