Accounts and annual returns HARLOW WILD CAT TRUST

Charity number: 295558
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 10 February 2011 14 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2010 22 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2010 Not Required
Annual return 10 February 2009 24 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 February 2009 Not Required