HARLOW WILD CAT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care of feral cats, mainly, but also any badly in need of help where other local animal organisations are unable to accomodate them, but only if we are able to do so, which isnt often, as we are now trying to run our charity down; and this is our main priority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Essex
Governance
- 10 February 1987: Standard registration
- 03 December 2012: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/02/2007 | 10/02/2008 | 10/02/2009 | 10/02/2010 | 10/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £219 | £295 | £200 | £200 | £553 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £504 | £358 | £200 | £172 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 February 2011 | 14 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 February 2010 | 22 July 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 February 2009 | 24 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 February 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1KTH OCTOBER 1986 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25TH JUNE 1987.
Charitable objects
THE CARE OF CATS PARTICULARLY THE EASING OF SUFFERING OF STRAY CATS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window