Financial history WALTHAM FOREST CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 295620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.73k £73.52k £57.55k £67.58k £75.16k
Total expenditure £60.85k £40.17k £61.13k £56.64k £63.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A