THE ANIMAL SHELTER CAMPAIGN
Charity number: 295638
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Animals
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Northamptonshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 February 1987: Standard registration
- 07 June 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- T A S C (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 15 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 09 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD NOVEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST GENERALLY IN THE RESCUE AND REHABILITATION OF ILL-TREATED AND NEGLECTED ANIMALS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO ANIMAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window