Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY NURSES EQUIPMENT FUND
Charity number: 295640
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 20 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 20 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 09 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 06 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 06 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 24 January 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window