NEWNHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain the fabric of the village hall so that it can be used (for rent) by organisations and individuals in the area, this includes holding some fund raising events which enables the Village Hall rent to be maintained at realistic levels for small groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 28 July 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Surridge | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Crampton | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA ELLEN WAIT | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Dixon | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Steven Geoffrey Dixon | Trustee | 07 October 2009 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey KIRBY | Trustee | 17 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
DEREK LITTLE | Trustee | 13 August 2005 |
|
|
||||
SUE KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.31k | £20.64k | £6.92k | £4.02k | £4.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £2.46k | £2.19k | £3.54k | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEWNHAM INCLUDING USE OF MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NEWNHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calico Orchard
The Street
Newnham
SITTINGBOURNE
ME9 0LN
- Phone:
- 01795890205
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window