SHREE KUTCH SATSANG SWAMINARAYAN TEMPLE (EAST LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) To promote the Hindu Faith in accordance with the principles and faiths of Lord Swaminarayan and to advance the religious education of the public in such principles as laid down in Shikshapatri and Vachhanamrat and as per the General Direction of the Shree Narnarayan Dev Temple Bhuj (Kutch). (2) To relieve the aged the poor the sick and the disabled
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Newham
- Redbridge
- India
Governance
- 05 December 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHAMJI KANJI PATEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DINESH KANJI HIRANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VISHRAM SHAMJI SIYANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARVIND KALYAN VEKARIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DHANJI VELJI BHUDIA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.57k | £237.14k | £271.58k | £392.53k | £339.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.21k | £80.66k | £121.70k | £179.59k | £159.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 DECEMBER 1986 AND AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 2002 AND 2 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 03 APR 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE HINDU FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND FAITHS OF LORD SWAMINARAYAN AND TO ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PRINCIPLES AS LAID DOWN IN SHIKSHAPATRI AND VACHHANAMRAT AND AS PER THE GENERAL DIRECTION OF THE NARNARAYAN DEV TEMPLE BHUJ. (2) TO RELIEVE THE AGED THE POOR THE SICK AND THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SKS Swaminarayan Temple East London
Swaminarayan House
22-24 Shaftesbury Road
LONDON
E7 8PD
- Phone:
- 02085940345
- Email:
- dhanjibhudia@live.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window