ST ANDREWS (HORNCHURCH) CHURCHYARD MAINTENANCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the Trust is used to keep the Churchyard in good order and repair, providing and/or maintaining equipment necessary for such preservation and providing stock.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Havering
Governance
- 26 November 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Brian Shearmur | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev KENNETH ANDREW WYLIE | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.17k | £19.26k | £18.50k | £18.20k | £17.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.13k | £19.08k | £19.08k | £19.71k | £17.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT IPSWICH DISTRICT PROBATE REGISTRY ON 21ST FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND SHALL BE APPLIED IN MAINTAINING THE CHURCHYARD IN GOOD ORDER AND REPAIR INCLUDING PROVIDING AND/OR MAINTAINING EQUIPMENT NECESSARY FOR SUCH MAINTENANCE AND PROVIDING STOCK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
222 HIGH STREET
HORNCHURCH
RM12 6QP
- Phone:
- 01708454620
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window