ST EDWARD'S HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of a town hall for the use of the inhabitants of Stow on the Wold and surrounding neighbourhoods, with the object of improving conditions of life for the people of Stow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 November 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Whitcomb | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Schoen | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Norris | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Reginald Eastabrook | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JENNI TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.39k | £24.82k | £32.04k | £43.00k | £33.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.50k | £15.13k | £28.32k | £28.26k | £25.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £17.27k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26TH JUNE 1980 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 74D 17 APRIL 2009 as amended on 05 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF STOW-ON-THE-WOLD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LESIURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STOW-ON-THE-WOLD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TRUSTEES
ST EDWARDS HALL
STOW ON THE WOLD
CHELTENHAM
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL54 1AF
- Phone:
- 07929539479
- Email:
- Enq@stedwardshall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window