Financial history THE 21ST CENTURY TRUST

Charity number: 295676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £160.92k £142.65k £140.46k £88.95k £26.36k
Total expenditure £92.07k £101.81k £122.15k £64.07k £68.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A