Governing document MIND IN BARNET
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11 JULY 1985 AS ALTERED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 20 AUGUST 1986, 21 NOVEMBER 1990, 14 OCTOBER 1992, 14 MAY 1997, JAN 2000, OCT 2003, 18 JULY 2007, 19 JULY 2011 AND 24 OCTOBER 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY ENABLING AND EMPOWERING EVERYONE EXPERIENCING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS TO LIVE WITH, MANAGE AND RECOVER FROM THEIR CONDITION; AND B) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY WORKING TO INCREASE THE UNDERSTANDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY GATHERING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION AND WORKING TO RAISE AWARENESS, PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND CHALLENGE STIGMA AND DISCRIMINATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL BUT PRINCIPALLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.