BELVEDERE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation and management of the Belvedere Community Centre, Belvoir Street, Norwich
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON BETTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NAOMI CORK | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHANE HAGUE | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIE COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RALPH CARMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BURDETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.92k | £40.37k | £20.60k | £22.17k | £34.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.85k | £36.45k | £33.36k | £34.75k | £39.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 December 2024 | 679 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2024 | 1044 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2024 | 1046 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT FO THE INHABITANTS OF TE SANDRINGHAM G.I.A. AND SURROUNDGIN AREAS OF NORWICH WITHOUT DINSTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITCAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPIONONS BY ASSOCIATIING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILTIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FO RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDTIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS;TO ESTABLISH A COMMUITY CENTRED AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH AY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN TH MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATON AND INTS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SANDRINGHAM G.I.A. AND THE SURRONDING AREA OF NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BELVEDERE COMMUNITY CENTRE
BELVOIR STREET
NORWICH
NR2 3AZ
- Phone:
- 01603616894
- Email:
- belvederecentre@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
thebelvedere.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window