EPSOM & EWELL PUFFINS CLUB (DSE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL/SPORTS FACILITIES FOR THOSE WITH LEARNING AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES. ALSO SOCIAL ACTIVITIES/OUTINGS SEVERAL TIMES PER ANNUM, INCLUDING A WEEKEND AWAY AT, FOR EXAMPLE, A LEISURE PARK. ACTIVITIES INCLUDE SHORT MAT BOWLS, SWIMMING, TABLE TENNIS, BOCCIA, NEW AGE KURLING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 January 1986: Standard registration
- EPSOM 7 EWELL PUFFINS CLUB (DSE) (Previous name)
- EPSOM AND EWELL PUFFINS CLUB (BSAD) (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Virginia Jamieson | Chair | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Brady | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Robert Jamieson | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Collison | Trustee | 12 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.34k | £6.31k | £966 | £2.87k | £5.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.59k | £7.41k | £279 | £7.49k | £9.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 March 2025 | 272 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/12/1986 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION SPORT AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED AND HANDICAPPED PEOPLE RESIDENT IN EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR COMPETITIVE AND NON-COMPETITIVE SPORT AND RECREATION TO ASSIST IN THEIR SOCIAL INTEGRATION.
Area of benefit
EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Briane Road
EPSOM
Surrey
Surrey
KT19 8QN
- Phone:
- 07939852277
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window