THE SOUTHAMPTON UNIVERSITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purpose of the Trust is to support the University of Southampton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 12 December 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON | Trustee | 31 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.99k | £26.19k | £31.15k | £34.78k | £41.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.92k | £27.20k | £14.66k | £34.14k | £35.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 29 MARCH 1993 AND RESOLUTION DATED 22 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
(A) THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON BY WAY OF GIFT, GRANT, LOAN, GUARANTEE OR SUCH OTHER FORM OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OR BENEFIT OF THE UNIVERSITY.(B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE CONNECTED WITH AND ACCEPTABLE TO THE UNIVERSITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHAMPTON
UNIVERSITY ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO17 1BJ
- Phone:
- 023 80595000
- Email:
- supportus@soton.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window