Financial history YOUTH FOR UNDERSTANDING LIMITED

Charity number: 295792
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £21.00k £64.52k £27.65k £232 £24.48k
Total expenditure £10.81k £28.46k £32.05k £16.17k £8.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A