Financial history BRISTOL AND AVON FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 295799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.55k £24.45k £42.94k £19.78k £18.91k
Total expenditure £30.13k £22.10k £24.28k £22.51k £25.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A