KERALA CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (UK) CHARITY FUND

Charity Number: 295820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of financial support mainly for education to the very poor in Kerala, S. India.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,767
Total expenditure: £4,082

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • KERALA CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Jacob Trustee 05 December 2020
None on record
Dr Jayin Koduvath Jacob Trustee 24 June 2018
None on record
Ajit Thomas Trustee 29 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.74k £5.47k £3.65k £4.36k £3.77k
Total expenditure £13.00k £4.88k £12.01k £6.95k £4.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Hewlett Close
ADDLESTONE
Surrey
KT15 2FS
Phone:
+44 7759 830485
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available